PA SB929 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the sale of certain course materials at institutions of higher education, for responsibilities of faculty and institutions of higher education and for college textbook rental pilot programs; and establishing the College Textbook Policies Advisory Committee.
Title
Providing for the sale of certain course materials at institutions of higher education, for responsibilities of faculty and institutions of higher education and for college textbook rental pilot programs; and establishing the College Textbook Policies Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - SB 929 PN 2077, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2010-06-23 | In the House | |
2010-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-21 | Amended on second consideration | |
2010-06-14 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-07-09 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-23 | First consideration | |
2009-06-23 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-05 | Referred to EDUCATION |