PA SB906 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 3 (Agriculture) and 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the definitions of "agricultural biosecurity area" and for "posted notice"; and further providing for keeping and handling of domestic animals, for ecoterrorism and for criminal trespass.
Title
Providing for the definitions of "agricultural biosecurity area" and for "posted notice"; and further providing for keeping and handling of domestic animals, for ecoterrorism and for criminal trespass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-15 - House - SB 906 PN 2121, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - Senate - SB 906 PN 2121, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - Senate - SB 906 PN 2121, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-23 | Act No. 125 | |
2010-11-23 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-11-22 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-11-22 | Signed in House | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-11-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-06 | Second consideration | |
2010-10-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-09-29 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-29 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-29 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-29 | First consideration | |
2010-09-29 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-28 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS | |
2010-09-28 | In the House | |
2010-09-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-22 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-09-21 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-21 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-20 | Removed from table | |
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-30 | First consideration | |
2010-06-30 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-05 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |