PA SB829 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-05 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-05 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 2008 (P.L.935, No.70), known as the Pennsylvania Climate Change Act, further providing for climate change action plan.
Title
Further providing for climate change action plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Senate - SB 829 PN 929, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2009-06-03 | In the House | |
2009-06-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-01 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-05 | First consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |