PA SB783 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2007 (P.L.486, No.77), known as the Hazardous Sites CleanUp Funding Act, providing for deposit of funds; and further providing for annual reports.
Title
Providing for deposit of funds; and further providing for annual reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-25 - Senate - SB 783 PN 1171, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2009-06-25 | In the House | |
2009-06-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-24 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-06-08 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-05 | First consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-17 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |