PA SB598 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-12 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-12 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, further providing for liability for tuition and enforcement of payment and for cost of tuition.
Title
In pupils and attendance, further providing for liability for tuition and enforcement of payment and for cost of tuition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-10 - Senate - SB 598 PN 888, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2009-06-10 | In the House | |
2009-06-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-03 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-28 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-21 | First consideration | |
2009-04-21 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to EDUCATION |