PA SB59 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, further providing for application for registration certificate, for issuance of registration certificate and for records; providing for disclosure; and further providing for emergency closure.
Title
Further providing for application for registration certificate, for issuance of registration certificate and for records; providing for disclosure; and further providing for emergency closure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-06 - Senate - SB 59 PN 758, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-09-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-27 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-27 | Laid on the table | |
2010-09-27 | First consideration | |
2010-09-27 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2009-05-06 | In the House | |
2009-05-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-04-27 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-25 | First consideration | |
2009-03-25 | Reported as amended | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |