PA SB56 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing, in provisions relating to safe schools, for definitions, for the Office for Safe Schools and for reporting by school entities.
Title
Further providing, in provisions relating to safe schools, for definitions, for the Office for Safe Schools and for reporting by school entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-25 - Senate - SB 56 PN 1214, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2009-06-25 | In the House | |
2009-06-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-24 | Amended on third consideration | |
2009-06-23 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-03-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-24 | First consideration | |
2009-03-24 | Reported as amended | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to EDUCATION |