PA SB507 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-05 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-05 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act establishing the Pennsylvania High-Risk Health Insurance Pool, the Pennsylvania High-Risk Health Insurance Pool Fund and the State Comprehensive Health Insurance Pool Board; providing for the powers and duties of the pool and the board; for selection of administering insurer and for payment of plan costs; and prescribing plan benefits.
Title
Establishing the Pennsylvania High-Risk Health Insurance Pool, the Pennsylvania High-Risk Health Insurance Pool Fund and the State Comprehensive Health Insurance Pool Board; providing for the powers and duties of the pool and the board; for selection of administering insurer and for payment of plan costs; and prescribing plan benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - Senate - SB 507 PN 1865, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Referred to INSURANCE | |
2010-05-03 | In the House | |
2010-05-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-04-20 | Second consideration | |
2010-04-19 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-04-14 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-14 | First consideration | |
2010-04-14 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |