PA SB500 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Act No. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 22, 1978 (P.L.1166, No.274), referred to as the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency Law, providing for County Adult Probation and Parole Advisory Committee, for county probation officers' firearm education and training, for justice reinvestment grants, phase 2, for continuing county probation and parole grants and for county intermediate punishment funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for County Adult Probation and Parole Advisory Committee, for county probation officers' firearm education and training, for justice reinvestment grants, phase 2, for continuing county probation and parole grants and for county intermediate punishment funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-18 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 500 PN 1433, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: SB 500 PN 1433, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 500 PN 1422, 2019 A4203, MCCLINTON (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: SB 500 PN 1422, 2019 A4205, KAUFFMAN (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03697 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03697 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 500 PN 850, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Senate Bill 500 PN -1 - Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-18SenateAct No. 114
2019-12-18SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-12-18SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-12-18SenateSigned in House
2019-12-18SenateSigned in Senate
2019-12-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (49-0)
2019-12-18SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-12-18SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-12-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-12-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-12-16HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-12-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-12-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-09HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-09HouseReported as amended
2019-06-06HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-06-05HouseIn the House
2019-06-05SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-06-03SenateRe-reported as amended
2019-05-08SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-08SenateSecond consideration
2019-05-01SenateFirst consideration
2019-05-01SenateReported as amended
2019-03-25SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=500
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0500&pn=0482
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0500&pn=0691
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0500&pn=0850
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0500&pn=1422
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0500&pn=1433
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=05/01/2019&RollCallId=134
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=189
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=101
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1467
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=952
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=953
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/17/2019&RollCallId=1539
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=973
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=373
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=12/18/2019&RollCallId=693
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1466
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1467

Bill Comments

feedback