PA SB471 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act prohibiting the mandatory COVID-19 vaccination of Pennsylvania residents by the Commonwealth, political subdivisions or as a condition of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the mandatory COVID-19 vaccination of Pennsylvania residents by the Commonwealth, political subdivisions or as a condition of employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A02850 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended A02850 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-13SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2022-01-26SenateRemoved from table
2022-01-26SenateLaid on the table
2021-11-08SenateFirst consideration
2021-11-08SenateReported as amended
2021-03-25SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback