PA SB440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for flexible instructional days.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for flexible instructional days.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] |
Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. Michele Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 440 PN 1029, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 440 PN 1029, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 440 PN 984, 2019 A2164, TOPPER (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01235 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 440 PN 418, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 440 PN 1029, FP (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: SB 440 PN 984, 2019 A2164, TOPPER (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01235 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 440 PN 418, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Act No. 64 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-1) |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-04-30 | House | In the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |