PA SB385 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 151
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 151
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 8, 2004 (P.L.1801, No.238), known as the Transit Revitalization Investment District Act, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in TRID creation and location, further providing for criteria for proposed TRID, for TRID designation, for implementing authority, for TRID planning study factors, for roles and responsibilities of public transportation agencies and municipalities and for amendments to TRID planning study; in land development powers of public transportation agencies, further providing for development or redevelopment of property and providing for additional powers of management entities and for prohibition on management entities; in value capture approaches, further providing for creation of value capture area and for dedication of tax revenues; providing for grant of TRID revenue and establishing the TRID fund; and, in community involvement, further providing for public meeting to explain TRID and alternative implementation approaches.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in TRID creation and location, further providing for criteria for proposed TRID, for TRID designation, for implementing authority, for TRID planning study factors, for roles and responsibilities of public transportation agencies and municipalities and for amendments to TRID planning study; in land development powers of public transportation agencies, further providing for development or redevelopment of property and providing for additional powers of management entities and for prohibition on management entities; in value capture approaches, further providing for creation of value capture area and for dedication of tax revenues; providing for grant of TRID revenue and establishing the TRID fund; and, in community involvement, further providing for public meeting to explain TRID and alternative implementation approaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 385 PN 2081, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 385 PN 2081, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor: SB 385 PN 1619, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor: SB 385 PN 1363, 2015 A4941, TAYLOR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03463 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03331 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03331 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03463 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 385 PN 738, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 385 PN 2081, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 385 PN 2081, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor: SB 385 PN 1619, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor: SB 385 PN 1363, 2015 A4941, TAYLOR (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03463 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03331 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03331 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A03463 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 385 PN 738, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | House | Act No. 151 |
2016-11-04 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (191-0) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (46-2) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-03-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2016-03-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Removed from table |
2016-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-18 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-01 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-27 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2015-04-20 | House | In the House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amended on second consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |