PA SB374 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: House Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for tagging and reporting big game kills.
Title
In hunting and furtaking, further providing for tagging and reporting big game kills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 374 PN 1641, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2016-04-05 | House | In the House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |