PA SB319 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, further providing for competitive bidding of contracts.
Title
Further providing for competitive bidding of contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-25 | First consideration | |
2009-03-25 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |