PA SB301 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-28 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-28 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for license fee for deployed Pennsylvania National Guard members and for resident license and fee exemptions.
Title
Further providing for license fee for deployed Pennsylvania National Guard members and for resident license and fee exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-16 - Senate - SB 301 PN 300, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | Removed from table | |
2010-09-28 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-14 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-09 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-09 | First consideration | |
2010-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-17 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES | |
2009-06-16 | In the House | |
2009-06-16 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-10 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-08 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-04 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-29 | First consideration | |
2009-04-29 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |