PA SB299 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of phishing.
Title
Providing for the offense of phishing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-31 - Senate - SB 299 PN 298, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-08-06 | Removed from table | |
2009-08-04 | Laid on the table | |
2009-08-04 | First consideration | |
2009-08-04 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-03-31 | In the House | |
2009-03-31 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-23 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-18 | First consideration | |
2009-03-18 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY |