PA SB298 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on October 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-27 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on October 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-27 - Act No. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1974 (P.L.973, No.319), known as the Pennsylvania Farmland and Forest Land Assessment Act of 1974, further providing for definitions, for general responsibilities of county assessors, for split-off, separation or transfer and for roll-back taxes and special circumstances.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for general responsibilities of county assessors, for split-off, separation or transfer and for roll-back taxes and special circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - SB 298 PN 2255, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-06 - House - SB 298 PN 2255, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - SB 298 PN 1624, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-06 - House - SB 298 PN 2255, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - SB 298 PN 1624, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-27 | Act No. 88 | |
2010-10-27 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-10-18 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-10-18 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-14 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-14 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2010-10-13 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2010-10-12 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-10-06 | In the Senate | |
2010-10-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-05 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-10-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-20 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-09 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-08 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-08 | First consideration | |
2010-06-08 | Reported as amended | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS | |
2010-02-02 | In the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-01-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-06-22 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |