PA SB214 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other offenses, further providing for the offense of greyhound racing.
Title
In other offenses, further providing for the offense of greyhound racing.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Michael O'Pake [D] |
Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - Senate - SB 214 PN 1951, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-15 | Removed from table | |
2010-06-14 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-14 | First consideration | |
2010-06-14 | Reported as committed | |
2010-05-26 | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT | |
2010-05-25 | In the House | |
2010-05-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-24 | Second consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Amended on second consideration | |
2010-04-14 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-14 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-09 | First consideration | |
2010-03-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |