PA SB1429 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on October 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-27 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on October 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-27 - Act No. 102
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for consolidations and mergers.
Title
Further providing for consolidations and mergers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - SB 1429 PN 2262, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-06 - House - SB 1429 PN 2257, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 187 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-05 - House - SB 1429 PN 2204, 2009 A9497, BROOKS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - SB 1429 PN 2204, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-06 - House - SB 1429 PN 2257, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 187 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-05 - House - SB 1429 PN 2204, 2009 A9497, BROOKS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - SB 1429 PN 2204, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-27 | Act No. 102 | |
2010-10-27 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-10-18 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-10-18 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-14 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-14 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2010-10-13 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2010-10-12 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-10-06 | In the Senate | |
2010-10-06 | Final passage | |
2010-10-06 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2010-10-05 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-10-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-10-04 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-10-04 | Removed from table | |
2010-10-04 | Laid on the table | |
2010-10-04 | First consideration | |
2010-10-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-09-29 | In the House | |
2010-09-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-09-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as amended | |
2010-06-28 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |