PA SB141 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 21, 1943 (P.L.571, No.254), known as The Fourth to Eighth Class County Assessment Law, eliminating office of assessor in boroughs and townships of the first class; making conforming amendments; and making repeals.
Title
Eliminating office of assessor in boroughs and townships of the first class; making conforming amendments; and making repeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Jane Earll [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] |
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Mary White [R] | Sen. Robert Wonderling [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - Senate - SB 141 PN 113, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-06-16 | Laid on the table | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-03-10 | In the House | |
2009-03-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-09 | Second consideration | |
2009-02-10 | First consideration | |
2009-02-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |