PA SB1409 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to LABOR RELATIONS
Pending: House Labor Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to LABOR RELATIONS
Pending: House Labor Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 18, 2001 (P.L.949, No.114), known as the Workforce Development Act, providing for industry partnerships.
Title
Providing for industry partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - SB 1409 PN 2120, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Referred to LABOR RELATIONS | |
2010-10-14 | In the House | |
2010-10-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-10-12 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-10-12 | Second consideration | |
2010-10-12 | Removed from table | |
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-30 | First consideration | |
2010-06-30 | Reported as amended | |
2010-06-16 | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |