PA SB139 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 1, 1966 (1965 P.L.1656, No.581), known as The Borough Code, further providing for officers to be elected, for election of assessors, for filling vacancies in elective borough offices, for powers of assessors and for duplicate assessments; and making related repeals.
Title
Further providing for officers to be elected, for election of assessors, for filling vacancies in elective borough offices, for powers of assessors and for duplicate assessments; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Jane Earll [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] |
Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Mary White [R] | Sen. Robert Wonderling [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - Senate - SB 139 PN 111, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-06-16 | Laid on the table | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-03-10 | In the House | |
2009-03-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-09 | Second consideration | |
2009-02-10 | First consideration | |
2009-02-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |