PA SB1379 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 28, 1988 (P.L.556, No.101), known as the Municipal Waste Planning, Recycling and Waste Reduction Act, in recycling and waste reduction, further providing for recycling at educational institutions.
Title
In recycling and waste reduction, further providing for recycling at educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - SB 1379 PN 2244, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2010-10-14 | In the House | |
2010-10-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-13 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-29 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-06-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-08 | First consideration | |
2010-06-08 | Reported as amended | |
2010-05-26 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |