PA SB1367 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on November 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-02 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Passed on November 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-02 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in public safety, providing for prescribing opioids to minors; imposing powers and duties on certain Commonwealth agencies and on the Legislative Reference Bureau; and imposing penalties.
Title
In public safety, providing for prescribing opioids to minors; imposing powers and duties on certain Commonwealth agencies and on the Legislative Reference Bureau; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1367 PN 2157, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 1367 PN 2157, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A10564 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1367 PN 2093, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1367 PN 2157, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 1367 PN 2157, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A10564 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1367 PN 2093, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-02 | Senate | Act No. 125 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2016-10-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | House | Second consideration |
2016-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-10-18 | House | First consideration |
2016-10-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-10-03 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2016-09-28 | House | In the House |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-09-23 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |