PA SB1334 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-16 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 30, 1965 (P.L.847, No.356), known as the Banking Code of 1965, further providing for additional powers of incorporated institutions related to conduct of business; and providing for ownership of property.
Title
Further providing for additional powers of incorporated institutions related to conduct of business; and providing for ownership of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-15 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-11-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |