PA SB1330 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-20 - Referred to INSURANCE
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, providing for coverage for BRCA-related genetic counseling and testing.
Title
In casualty insurance, providing for coverage for BRCA-related genetic counseling and testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1330 PN 1981, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-20 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2022-10-19 | House | In the House |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-09-15 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |