PA SB12 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, in public assistance, further providing for persons eligible for medical assistance.
Title
In public assistance, further providing for persons eligible for medical assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill removed from the table |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill laid on the table |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill removed from table |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented and laid on the table |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |