PA SB1197 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: House Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 24, 1968 (P.L.1040, No.318), known as the Coal Refuse Disposal Control Act, further providing for fees.
Title
Further providing for fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Jane Earll [R] | Sen. Raphael Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Michael Waugh [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. Mary White [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - Senate - SB 1197 PN 1602, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2010-05-24 | In the House | |
2010-05-24 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-04 | Second consideration | |
2010-04-19 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-03-17 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-09 | First consideration | |
2010-03-09 | Reported as committed | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |