PA SB1145 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Commission on Sentencing, further providing for adoption of guidelines for sentencing; and providing for adoption of risk and needs assessment instrument.
Title
In Pennsylvania Commission on Sentencing, further providing for adoption of guidelines for sentencing; and providing for adoption of risk and needs assessment instrument.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-08 - Senate - SB 1145 PN 1522, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2010-06-08 | In the House | |
2010-06-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-26 | Second consideration | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-02-01 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-15 | First consideration | |
2009-12-15 | Reported as committed | |
2009-11-25 | Referred to JUDICIARY |