PA SB1120 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in bonds and recognizances, providing for bail of persons posing threat to public safety.
Title
In bonds and recognizances, providing for bail of persons posing threat to public safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Devlin Robinson [R] | Sen. Wayne Langerholc [R] | Sen. Tracy Pennycuick [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] |
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Michele Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1120 PN 1436, Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1120 PN 1425, 2023 A3634, BAKER Amendment No. A-3634 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1120 PN 1425, 2023 A3634, BAKER Amendment No. A-3634 (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2024-04-09 | House | In the House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-16) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (36-13) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |