PA SB1101 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, further providing for curriculum, training and education certification management system.
Title
In Commonwealth services, further providing for curriculum, training and education certification management system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1101 PN 1427, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03630 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1101 PN 1427, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A03630 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2024-04-08 | House | In the House |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |