PA SB1062 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in burglary and other criminal intrusions, further providing for burglary; and in sentencing, providing for sentencing for burglary.
Title
In burglary and other criminal intrusions, further providing for burglary; and in sentencing, providing for sentencing for burglary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 2109, FP (Y: 146 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, 2015 A9846, NEUMAN (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, 2015 A9661, STEPHENS (Y: 145 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 2109, FP (Y: 146 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, 2015 A9846, NEUMAN (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-09-28 - House - House Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, 2015 A9661, STEPHENS (Y: 145 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1062 PN 1679, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | House | Act No. 158 |
2016-11-04 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (191-1) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (47-0) |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 1679 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (146-46) |
2016-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-09-28 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-20 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-05-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-05-10 | House | In the House |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-04-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-11-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |