PA SB1056 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in Treasury Department, further providing for investment of moneys.
Title
In Treasury Department, further providing for investment of moneys.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] |
Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. Nicholas Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1056 PN 1364, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 1056 PN 1364, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2024-04-29 | House | In the House |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-03-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |