PA SB104 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, providing for State-owned vehicle use.
Title
Providing for State-owned vehicle use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-14 - Senate - SB 104 PN 2025, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2010-06-14 | In the House | |
2010-06-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-07 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-02-01 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-02-01 | Second consideration | |
2010-01-26 | First consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |