PA SB1034 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 23, 1970 (P.L.563, No.195), known as the Public Employe Relations Act, further providing for declaration of public policy, for definitions and for maintenance of membership; providing for membership dues; prohibiting certain provisions relating to political contributions; and making related repeals.
Title
Further providing for declaration of public policy, for definitions and for maintenance of membership; providing for membership dues; prohibiting certain provisions relating to political contributions; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Michael Waugh [R] | Sen. Michael Brubaker [R] |
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. Scott Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |