PA SB1011 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-27 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school districts, further providing for State report card; providing for value-added assessment system and for school report card; in certification of teachers, further providing for certificates qualifying persons to teach and for kinds of State certificates; providing for postbaccalaureate certification; further providing for disqualifications relating to teacher's certificate; in school health services, providing for medical examinations of teachers and other persons; and, in education empowerment, further providing for boards of control in certain school districts and for expiration.
Title
In school districts, further providing for State report card; providing for value-added assessment system and for school report card; in certification of teachers, further providing for certificates qualifying persons to teach and for kinds of State certificates; providing for postbaccalaureate certification; further providing for disqualifications relating to teacher's certificate; in school health services, providing for medical examinations of teachers and other persons; and, in education empowerment, further providing for boards of control in certain school districts and for expiration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - Senate - SB 1011 PN 2001, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - Senate - SB 1011 PN 1953, A6910, WOZNIAK AMENDMENT NO. A-6910 (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-05-25 - Senate - SB 1011 PN 1953, A6910, WOZNIAK AMENDMENT NO. A-6910 (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2010-05-26 | In the House | |
2010-05-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-25 | Amended on third consideration | |
2010-05-24 | Second consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-02-03 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-16 | First consideration | |
2009-12-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-10 | Referred to EDUCATION |