PA HR797 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating April 27, 2020, as "Don't Text and Drive Day" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating April 27, 2020, as "Don't Text and Drive Day" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |