PA HR425 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Adopted (196-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the month of June 2019 as "National Myasthenia Gravis Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the month of June 2019 as "National Myasthenia Gravis Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HR 425 PN 2251 (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | House | Adopted (196-0) |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-09-24 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-06-25 | House | INTRODUCED AS NONCONTROVERSIAL RESOLUTION UNDER RULE 35 |