PA HB971 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-17 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in inheritance tax, further providing for inheritance tax rate.
Title
In inheritance tax, further providing for inheritance tax rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 971 PN 1227, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 971 PN 1227, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-17 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2016-03-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2016-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-04 | House | Second consideration |
2015-04-22 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to FINANCE |