PA HB951 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-11 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-11 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of January 19, 1968 (1967 P.L.992, No.442), entitled "An act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the local government units thereof to preserve, acquire or hold land for open space uses," further providing for local taxing options.
Title
An Act amending the act of January 19, 1968 (1967 P.L.992, No.442), entitled "An act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania and the local government units thereof to preserve, acquire or hold land for open space uses," further providing for local taxing options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-06 - House - HB 951 PN 1089, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-17 | First consideration | |
2009-07-17 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-05-06 | In the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Final passage | |
2009-05-06 | Vote on final passage reconsidered | |
2009-05-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-29 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-29 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-28 | First consideration | |
2009-04-28 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |