PA HB93 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-01 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-01 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in planning agencies, further providing for appointment, term and vacancy of planning commission members and for conduct of business of planning commission.
Title
In planning agencies, further providing for appointment, term and vacancy of planning commission members and for conduct of business of planning commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - House - HB 93 PN 85, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-03-10 | In the Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-09 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-02-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-10 | First consideration | |
2009-02-10 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |