PA HB928 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for prohibited acts and penalties. Amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege.
Title
Further providing for prohibited acts and penalties. Amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07885 (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09937 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07885 (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09937 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-10-09 | House | First consideration |
2018-10-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to JUDICIARY |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |