PA HB928 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.233, No.64), known as The Controlled Substance, Drug, Device and Cosmetic Act, further providing for prohibited acts and penalties. Amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for prohibited acts and penalties. Amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for suspension of operating privilege.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A07885 (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09937 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-09HouseReported as amended
2017-05-08HouseRe-referred to JUDICIARY
2017-05-08HouseReported with request to re-refer to JUDICIARY
2017-03-22HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=928
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0928&pn=1081
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0928&pn=4189
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=348
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2022
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2023

Bill Comments

feedback