PA HB906 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-30 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 24, 1931 (P.L.1206, No.331), known as The First Class Township Code, in general provisions relating to township officers, further providing for failure of officer to perform duties.
Title
In general provisions relating to township officers, further providing for failure of officer to perform duties.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Harper [R] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 906 PN 1103, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 906 PN 1103, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 906 PN 1103, FP (Y: 188 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | Senate | Act No. 52 |
2015-10-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (188-1) |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-16 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-03 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |