PA HB904 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-15)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-12 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, adding provisions to authorize temporary development moratorium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, adding provisions to authorize temporary development moratorium.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2007-12-12 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2007-12-12 Removed from table
2007-12-11 Laid on the table
2007-12-11 First consideration
2007-12-11 Reported as amended
2007-03-22 Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback