PA HB90 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for prevention of abduction of children.
Title
Providing for prevention of abduction of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-11 - House - HB 90 PN 82, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-13 | First consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Reported as committed | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-05-11 | In the Senate | |
2009-05-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-06 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-29 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-29 | Removed from table | |
2009-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2009-04-28 | First consideration | |
2009-04-28 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to JUDICIARY |