PA HB882 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 22, 1974 (P.L.589, No.205), known as the Unfair Insurance Practices Act, further providing for unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices defined.
Title
Further providing for unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices defined.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01776 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-09-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-09-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |