PA HB838 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-29 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, providing for access to community pharmacy services.
Title
Providing for access to community pharmacy services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - House - HB 838 PN 1152, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 190 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - HB 838 PN 1152, 2009 A439, KILLION (Y: 90 N: 101 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-03-24 - House - HB 838 PN 1152, 2009 A439, KILLION (Y: 90 N: 101 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-08 | First consideration | |
2010-06-08 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-27 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2009-03-25 | In the Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-24 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-18 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-18 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-18 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-18 | First consideration | |
2009-03-18 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to INSURANCE |