PA HB786 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act establishing the State Energy Office; and imposing duties on the State Energy Office.
Title
Establishing the State Energy Office; and imposing duties on the State Energy Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - House - HB 786 PN 2148, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 111 N: 83 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-22 | First consideration | |
2010-06-22 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-26 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2009-06-23 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-17 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-03-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-17 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-17 | First consideration | |
2009-03-17 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-06 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |