PA HB776 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-19)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-23 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-23 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Title
Further providing for the authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-05 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |